Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/17/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 08/01/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/09/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 10/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 02/10/2014