Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/10/2014