Refine your search

Refined by:

Massachusetts Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/16/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/10/2014