Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/11/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/31/2014