Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013