Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/16/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/21/2013