Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/16/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/17/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/17/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 04/25/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/15/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/16/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/10/2014