Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-240.
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/12/2014 Presented to President.
12/10/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8994-8998)
12/08/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/24/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5696-5697)
06/19/2014 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-478.
03/20/2013 Introduced in House