Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/28/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/15/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/03/2014