Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/09/2013