Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/09/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/24/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/09/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/14/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/13/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/29/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/12/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/13/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew