Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/12/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew