Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/14/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/27/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/24/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew