Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/15/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/15/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/15/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/09/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/31/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/08/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/10/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/22/2014