Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/13/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/30/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/08/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/31/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/13/2013