Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/10/2014