Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/23/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/11/2014