Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/20/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/08/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2013