Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/18/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/19/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/24/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/07/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/21/2014