Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/03/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/17/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/26/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/07/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/11/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/09/2014