Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/24/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/24/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/24/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/25/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/02/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/29/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/23/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/08/2014