Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/10/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/15/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/21/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/11/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2014