Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/17/2013