Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/10/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/10/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/10/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/22/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/05/2014