Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/26/2013