Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/26/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/30/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/13/2014