Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2013