Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/25/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/25/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/26/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/05/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2014