Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/10/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/26/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/03/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/06/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/19/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/26/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 09/08/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/08/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/08/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/15/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/17/2014