Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/25/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/14/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/28/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2014