Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/21/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/10/2014