Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/11/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/11/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 07/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/17/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/30/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/31/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/10/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/10/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/10/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/12/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/17/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/19/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/25/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/07/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 10/07/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/29/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/10/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/07/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/11/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/14/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/14/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/17/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/17/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/17/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/08/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/16/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/16/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/01/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/11/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/11/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/16/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/16/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/13/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/04/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/08/2014