Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
08/09/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-27.
08/09/2013 Signed by President.
08/06/2013 Presented to President.
08/02/2013 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5376-5377)
08/01/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2013 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/21/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 0 (Roll no. 166).(text: CR H2819-2820)
03/21/2013 Introduced in House