Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/09/2014