Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/11/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/06/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/01/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/07/2014