Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/19/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/19/2014