Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/20/2014