Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/27/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/04/2014