Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/2014