Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/17/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/17/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/19/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/24/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 08/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/18/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/29/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/04/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/14/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/04/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/04/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/06/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/06/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/13/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/01/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/19/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 12/09/2014