Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/22/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/05/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/05/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/06/2013