Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/15/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/25/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/25/2013