Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-241.
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/17/2014 Presented to President.
12/15/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6840)
12/09/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8898)
04/09/2014 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-406.
03/21/2013 Introduced in House