There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Large Capacity Ammunition Feeding Device Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the transfer or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/25/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/14/2013
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/14/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/14/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 02/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2013
Del. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/11/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/03/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/25/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.138. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2013)

Large Capacity Ammunition Feeding Device Act - Amends the Brady Handgun Violence Prevention Act to prohibit: (1) the transfer or possession of a large capacity ammunition feeding device, except for such a device lawfully possessed within the United States on or before the date of this Act's enactment; and (2) the importation or bringing into the United States of such a device.

Exempts: (1) the transfer or possession of such a device by a federal, state, or local agency or law enforcement officer; (2) certain transfers to licensees under the Atomic Energy Act of 1954; (3) possession of such a device transferred to an individual upon retirement from a law enforcement agency if such individual is not otherwise prohibited from receiving ammunition; and (4) the manufacture, transfer, or possession of such a device by a licensed manufacturer or importer for authorized testing or experimentation purposes.

Sets penalties for violations.

Requires a large capacity ammunition feeding device manufactured after this Act's enactment to be identified by a serial number that clearly shows that the device was manufactured after such enactment.