Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/14/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/14/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 01/14/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/14/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/14/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/14/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/14/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/14/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/14/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/14/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/14/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/14/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/15/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 01/15/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/22/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/22/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/22/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/22/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/22/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/25/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/25/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/05/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/25/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/04/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/11/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/11/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014