Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/18/2014