There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Wildlife Refuge System Conservation Semipostal Stamp Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Wildlife Refuge System Conservation Semipostal Stamp Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the issuance of a Wildlife Refuge System Conservation Semipostal Stamp.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/06/2013Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-100, Part I.
03/21/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
06/06/2013Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-100, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/15/2013Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/15/2013Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/15/2013Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/25/2013Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs
04/11/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/21/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2013Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/21/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources03/21/2013 Referred to
05/15/2013 Markup by
06/06/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-100
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs04/11/2013 Referred to
04/25/2013 Hearings by
05/15/2013 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1384.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1384. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment, Part I (06/06/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Wildlife Refuge System Conservation Semipostal Stamp Act of 2013 - Directs the United States Postal Service (USPS) to issue and sell, at a premium, a Wildlife Refuge System Conservation Semipostal Stamp. Requires the use of such stamp to be voluntary on the part of postal patrons.

Requires proceeds from the sale of the semipostal stamp to be transferred to the United States Fish and Wildlife Service (USFWS) to help fund the maintenance backlog and operational shortfall of the National Wildlife Refuge System. Prohibits such proceeds from being taken into account in any decision relating to the level of appropriations or other federal funding to be furnished to the USFWS or allocated to the System.

Requires the stamp to be made available to the public for at least two years.