Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/15/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/18/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/18/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 04/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/18/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/06/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/05/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/06/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/11/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/22/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/08/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/18/2014