Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/27/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/24/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/31/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 07/31/2014