Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/21/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 03/21/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/19/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/19/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/25/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/06/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/06/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/17/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/24/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 08/01/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 08/01/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/17/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/17/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/23/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/09/2014